TN HB0634 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-11 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-11 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires local government entities to develop and implement policies to notify persons about whom an employee communicates images or statements on social networks or other methods of communication that the entity perceives as threatening harm to the person. - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 8 and Title 49.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 8 and Title 49, relative to employment policies of local governmental entities.
Sponsors
Rep. Yusuf Hakeem [D] | Rep. Larry Miller [D] | Rep. Antonio Parkinson [D] | Rep. John Clemmons [D] |
Rep. Jesse Chism [D] | Rep. Dwayne Thompson [D] | Rep. Joe Towns [D] | Rep. Johnny Shaw [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-11 | House | Withdrawn. |
2021-03-09 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Cities & Counties Subcommittee of Local Government Committee |
2021-03-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Cities & Counties Subcommittee for 3/9/2021 |
2021-02-20 | House | Assigned to s/c Cities & Counties Subcommittee |
2021-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2021-02-10 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-08 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0367 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-10 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee