TN HB0624 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-06 - Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
Pending: House Calendar and Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, makes an offender sentenced pursuant to judicial diversion eligible for removal from the sex offender registry upon completion of judicial diversion. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 35 and Title 40, Chapter 39.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, makes an offender sentenced pursuant to judicial diversion eligible for removal from the sex offender registry upon completion of judicial diversion. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 35 and Title 40, Chapter 39.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-06HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2019-02-27HousePlaced on cal. Judiciary for 3/6/2019
2019-02-27HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Judiciary
2019-02-20HousePlaced on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/27/2019
2019-02-11HouseAssigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
2019-02-07HouseP2C, ref. to Judiciary
2019-02-06HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-02-04HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0544 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-12 - Failed in Senate Judiciary Committee / no second

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback