TN SB0544 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Companion House Bill substituted
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, makes an offender sentenced pursuant to judicial diversion eligible for removal from the sex offender registry upon completion of judicial diversion. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 35 and Title 40, Chapter 39.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, makes an offender sentenced pursuant to judicial diversion eligible for removal from the sex offender registry upon completion of judicial diversion. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 35 and Title 40, Chapter 39.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-01SenateCompanion House Bill substituted
2019-04-30SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 5/1/2019
2019-04-30SenateSenate Reset on calendar for 5/1/2019
2019-04-30SenateReset on next available calendar
2019-04-25SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/30/2019
2019-04-23SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 5, Nays 3 PNV 0
2019-04-17SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/23/2019
2019-03-12SenateFailed in Senate Judiciary Committee / no second
2019-03-06SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/12/2019
2019-03-05SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/12/2019
2019-02-27SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/5/2019
2019-02-07SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2019-02-06SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-04SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0624 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-24 - Signed by Governor.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback