TN HB0608 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-03 - Pub. Ch. 512
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-03 - Pub. Ch. 512
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, removes provisions related to annexation by ordinance, to effectuate the provisions of Chapter 707 of the Public Acts of 2014 to abolish annexation by ordinance; authorizes, in certain circumstances and counties, a municipality, by resolution, to propose annexation of territory that does not adjoin the boundary of the main part of the municipality if the territory proposed for annexation is entirely contained within the municipality's urban growth boundary. - Amends TCA Title 6, Chapter 51 and Title 6, Chapter 58.
Title
As enacted, removes provisions related to annexation by ordinance, to effectuate the provisions of Chapter 707 of the Public Acts of 2014 to abolish annexation by ordinance; authorizes, in certain circumstances and counties, a municipality, by resolution, to propose annexation of territory that does not adjoin the boundary of the main part of the municipality if the territory proposed for annexation is entirely contained within the municipality's urban growth boundary. - Amends TCA Title 6, Chapter 51 and Title 6, Chapter 58.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 3 (Y: 82 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT Rule 39(3) AMEND# 3 BY watson (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT Rule 39(3) AMEND# 3 BY watson (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-03 | Pub. Ch. 512 | |
2015-06-03 | Effective date(s) 06/29/2015 | |
2015-05-20 | Signed by Governor. | |
2015-05-08 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2015-05-06 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2015-04-27 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2015-04-22 | House | H. concurred in S. am. no. 3, Ayes 82, Nays 3 |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - SA0488) |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 3 - SA0489) |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Motion to reconsider adopted. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Motion to lift from the table. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Senate Recalled from House |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 29, Nays 0 |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0225) |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-04-14 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2015-04-14 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2015-04-14 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0367) |
2015-04-09 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/14/2015 |
2015-04-08 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/9/2015 |
2015-04-07 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2015-04-01 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 4/7/2015 |
2015-04-01 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee |
2015-03-25 | House | Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 4/1/2015 |
2015-03-25 | House | Action Def. in s/c Local Government Subcommittee to 4/1/2015 |
2015-03-24 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-03-18 | House | Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 3/25/2015 |
2015-02-12 | House | Assigned to s/c Local Government Subcommittee |
2015-02-12 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2015-02-11 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2015-02-10 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0755 (Crossfiled) 2015-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 512