TN HB0583 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-08 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-08 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, increases the criminal penalty for the sale or manufacture of fentanyl from a Class C felony to a Class B felony; reduces the criminal penalty by one classification for certain marijuana-related offenses. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 4 and Title 40.
Title
As introduced, increases the criminal penalty for the sale or manufacture of fentanyl from a Class C felony to a Class B felony; reduces the criminal penalty by one classification for certain marijuana-related offenses. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 4 and Title 40.
Sponsors
Rep. Harold Love [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-08 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-05-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 5/8/2017 |
2017-04-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 5/2/2017 |
2017-04-26 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2017-04-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/26/2017 |
2017-04-19 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 4/26/2017 |
2017-04-12 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/19/2017 |
2017-04-12 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2017-04-12 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-04-05 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 4/12/2017 |
2017-04-04 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 4/4/2017 |
2017-02-14 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2017-02-09 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-02-07 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0825 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-09 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee