TN HB0570 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Effective date(s) 05/25/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Effective date(s) 05/25/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, increases from 75 to 90 days that amount of time for which the house or senate government operations committee may stay a rule; authorizes additional 90-day stays by committees acting jointly in certain circumstances. - Amends TCA Section 4-5-215.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 4-5-215, relative to the stay of the effective date of a rule.
Sponsors
Rep. John Ragan [R] | Rep. Jerome Moon [R] | Rep. Dave Wright [R] | Rep. Bruce Griffey [R] |
Rep. Bryan Terry [R] | Rep. Robin Smith [R] | Rep. Dan Howell [R] | Rep. Debra Moody [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-05 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Conference Committee Report Motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MESSAGE CALENDAR MOTION TO ADOPT CONFERENCE COMMITTEE REPORT (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MESSAGE CALENDAR CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 1 (Y: 75 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 81 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MESSAGE CALENDAR MOTION TO ADOPT CONFERENCE COMMITTEE REPORT (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MESSAGE CALENDAR CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 1 (Y: 75 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 81 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-01 | Effective date(s) 05/25/2021 | |
2021-06-01 | Pub. Ch. 532 | |
2021-05-25 | Signed by Governor. | |
2021-05-13 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-05-11 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-05-07 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Conference Committee report adopted, |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar for 5/5/2021 |
2021-05-04 | House | Conf. comm. report adopted, Ayes 91, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2021-05-03 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 5/4/21 |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee appointed. Bell, Kyle, and Roberts. |
2021-04-28 | House | Conf. comm. appointed, Reps. Ragan, Reedy, and Windle |
2021-04-28 | House | H. refused to recede from its non-concurrence SA2 |
2021-04-27 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 4/28/21 |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Senate refused to recede from amendment |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar for 4/26/2021 |
2021-04-21 | House | H. concurred in S. am. no. SA1 Ayes 75, Nays 13 PNV 0 HB0570 |
2021-04-21 | House | H. nonconcurred in S. am. no. SA2 HB0570 |
2021-04-19 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 4/21/21 |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Senate adopted Senate Amendment #2 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/15/2021 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/15/2021 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0263) |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-04-08 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2021-04-08 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 81, Nays 5, PNV 0 |
2021-04-08 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0144) |
2021-04-08 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-01 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/8/2021 |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/1/2021 |
2021-03-29 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/29/2021 |
2021-03-01 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in Government Operations Committee |
2021-02-24 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/1/2021 |
2021-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1086 (Crossfiled) 2021-06-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 532