TN HB0562 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - Failed in s/c Banking & Investments Subcommittee of Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - Failed in s/c Banking & Investments Subcommittee of Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, establishes a fee imposed on customers for transmitting money through certain entities; requires the department of revenue to administer the collection of said fee; establishes a fund for the moneys collected and restrictions on their use. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 14, Part 9; Title 40, Chapter 33, Part 2; Title 45, Chapter 7, Part 2 and Title 67.
Title
As introduced, establishes a fee imposed on customers for transmitting money through certain entities; requires the department of revenue to administer the collection of said fee; establishes a fund for the moneys collected and restrictions on their use. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 14, Part 9; Title 40, Chapter 33, Part 2; Title 45, Chapter 7, Part 2 and Title 67.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-12 - House - HOUSE BANKING & INVESTMENTS SUBCOMMITTEE: Failed in s/c Banking & Investments Subcommittee of Commerce Committee (Y: 1 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-12 | House | Failed in s/c Banking & Investments Subcommittee of Commerce Committee |
2019-03-12 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Commerce Committee |
2019-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Banking & Investments Subcommittee for 3/12/2019 |
2019-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Banking & Investments Subcommittee |
2019-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Commerce Committee-- Government Operations for Review |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-02-04 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1504 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-12 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee