TN HB0560 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-3)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Pub. Ch. 296
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-3)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Pub. Ch. 296
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, creates the misdemeanor offense of unauthorized release of a law enforcement officer's residential address to the public, punishable as a Class B misdemeanor if the release is criminally negligent or a Class A misdemeanor if intentional. - Amends TCA Title 10, Chapter 7 and Title 39.
Title
As enacted, creates the misdemeanor offense of unauthorized release of a law enforcement officer's residential address to the public, punishable as a Class B misdemeanor if the release is criminally negligent or a Class A misdemeanor if intentional. - Amends TCA Title 10, Chapter 7 and Title 39.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-26 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-19 | Pub. Ch. 296 | |
2017-05-19 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2017 | |
2017-05-05 | Signed by Governor. | |
2017-05-02 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2017-05-01 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2017-04-26 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0471) |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-03-09 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2017-03-09 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 97, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2017-03-09 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-03-09 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0025) |
2017-03-02 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-03-02 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/9/2017 |
2017-03-01 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-03-01 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/2/2017 |
2017-03-01 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2017-02-28 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-02-22 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/1/2017 |
2017-02-21 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2017-02-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/21/2017 |
2017-02-14 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2017-02-09 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-02-07 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0467 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 296