TN HB0530 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-14 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-14 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires a pharmacist-generated prescription order written by a pharmacist in order to purchase a product that contains any immediate methamphetamine precursor; exempts gel capsules from such requirements. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 4.
Title
As introduced, requires a pharmacist-generated prescription order written by a pharmacist in order to purchase a product that contains any immediate methamphetamine precursor; exempts gel capsules from such requirements. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 4.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-14 | House | Withdrawn. |
2013-02-26 | House | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee |
2013-02-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/27/2013 |
2013-02-06 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2013-02-06 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee-- Health |
2013-02-04 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2013-01-31 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0985 (Crossfiled) 2014-02-06 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. Jud. com.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0530&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/HB0530.pdf |