TN SB0985 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-06 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. Jud. com.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires a pharmacist-generated prescription order written by a pharmacist in order to purchase a product that contains any immediate methamphetamine precursor; exempts gel capsules from such requirements. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 4.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, requires a pharmacist-generated prescription order written by a pharmacist in order to purchase a product that contains any immediate methamphetamine precursor; exempts gel capsules from such requirements. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 4.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-02-06SenateAssigned to Gen. Sub of S. Jud. com.
2013-02-06SenateP2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm.
2013-02-04SenateIntro., P1C.
2013-01-31SenateFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

HB0530 (Crossfiled) 2013-03-14 - Withdrawn.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback