TN HB0515 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 69
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 69
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, exempts smokeless nicotine products from the tax on tobacco products and cigarettes. - Amends TCA Section 67-4-1001 and Section 67-4-1005.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 67-4-1001 and Section 67-4-1005, relative to products containing nicotine.
Sponsors
Rep. Ron Gant [R] | Rep. Patsy Hazlewood [R] | Rep. Chris Todd [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-06 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 69 | |
2021-03-18 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2021-03-18 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-15 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/18/21 |
2021-03-15 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-15 | House | Objected to on Consent Calendar. |
2021-03-11 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/15/2021 |
2021-03-10 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/11/2021 |
2021-03-09 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-03-03 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 3/9/2021 |
2021-03-03 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-02-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/3/2021 |
2021-02-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2021-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-04 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0143 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-06 - Effective date(s) 03/31/2021