TN SB0143 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-09 - Refer to Senate F,W&M Revenue Subcommittee
Hearing: Mar 2 in Cordell Hull Building
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, exempts smokeless nicotine products from the tax on tobacco products and cigarettes. - Amends TCA Section 67-4-1001 and Section 67-4-1005.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 67-4-1001 and Section 67-4-1005, relative to products containing nicotine.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-09SenateRefer to Senate F,W&M Revenue Subcommittee
2021-01-15SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2021-01-14SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2021-01-13SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0515 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-24 - Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/3/2021

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback