TN HB0508 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-11 - Assigned to s/c Facilities, Licensure, & Regulations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-11 - Assigned to s/c Facilities, Licensure, & Regulations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, clarifies the name of an office within the office of the Attorney General; permits a not-for-profit hospital to electronically submit a request for an informal conference with the commissioner of health if the commissioner issues a certain civil penalty to the hospital; prohibits the commissioner from exercising certain enforcement measures. - Amends TCA Title 48; Title 67 and Title 68.
Title
As introduced, clarifies the name of an office within the office of the Attorney General; permits a not-for-profit hospital to electronically submit a request for an informal conference with the commissioner of health if the commissioner issues a certain civil penalty to the hospital; prohibits the commissioner from exercising certain enforcement measures. - Amends TCA Title 48; Title 67 and Title 68.
Sponsors
Rep. Ron Gant [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Facilities, Licensure, & Regulations Subcommittee |
2019-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-02-04 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1171 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-11 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee