TN HB0494 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-26 - Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
Pending: House Calendar and Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-26 - Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
Pending: House Calendar and Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, extends the health services and development agency to June 30, 2022. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 68, Chapter 11.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 68, Chapter 11, relative to the health services and development agency.
Sponsors
Rep. John Ragan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-26 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-04-21 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 4/27/2021 |
2021-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-03 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1077 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-28 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.