TN HB0471 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-04-18 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-04-18 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes a municipality or public authority in which a tourism development zone is located to file with the commissioner of finance and administration and the state building commission its annual report concerning the zone in an electronic format. - Amends TCA Title 7; Title 13 and Title 66.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 7; Title 13 and Title 66, relative to regulation of development.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-18 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2023-04-12 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/18/2023 |
2023-04-12 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2023-04-11 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2023-04-05 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 4/11/2023 |
2023-03-21 | House | Reset on Final cal. of Local Government Committee |
2023-03-15 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/21/2023 |
2023-03-15 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee |
2023-03-15 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-03-08 | House | Placed on s/c cal Property & Planning Subcommittee for 3/15/2023 |
2023-03-01 | House | Action Def. in s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee to 3/15/2023 |
2023-02-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Property & Planning Subcommittee for 3/1/2023 |
2023-02-22 | House | Assigned to s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee |
2023-02-22 | House | Ref. to Local Government Committee |
2023-02-01 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2023-01-30 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-25 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0513 (Crossfiled) 2023-03-28 - Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to first calendar of 2024