TN HB0468 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-22 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Elections of S&LG of State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-22 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Elections of S&LG of State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, limits time a candidate and candidate’s political campaign committee may make expenditures for advertising to no earlier than 120 days before an election and no later than 90 days after the last election in which the candidate participates. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 10.
Title
As introduced, limits time a candidate and candidate’s political campaign committee may make expenditures for advertising to no earlier than 120 days before an election and no later than 90 days after the last election in which the candidate participates. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 10.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-22 | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Elections of S&LG of State & Local Government Committee | |
2009-04-15 | Placed on s/c cal Elections of S&LG for 04/22/2009 | |
2009-02-17 | Assigned to s/c Elections of S&LG | |
2009-02-12 | P2C, ref. to State & Local Government | |
2009-02-11 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-09 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0572 (Crossfiled) 2009-04-20 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. S&L Govt. Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0468&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB0468.pdf |