TN HB0466 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-30 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-30 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, establishes a pilot program for three years to provide child care payments to eligible relative caregivers; requires the department of children's services to publish an annual report containing certain data about the pilot program. - Amends TCA Title 37 and Title 71.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 37 and Title 71, relative to caregivers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-30 | House | Returned to the Clerk's Desk. |
2022-03-23 | House | Placed on s/c cal Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee for 3/30/2022 |
2022-03-23 | House | Action Def. in s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee to 3/30/2022 |
2022-03-16 | House | Placed on s/c cal Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee for 3/23/2022 |
2022-03-16 | House | Action Def. in s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee to 3/23/2022 |
2022-03-09 | House | Placed on s/c cal Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee for 3/16/2022 |
2022-03-09 | House | Action Def. in s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee to 3/16/2022 |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on s/c cal Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee for 3/9/2022 |
2022-02-02 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee |
2022-01-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee for 2/2/2022 |
2021-03-31 | House | Action Def. in s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee to First Calendar of 2022 |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee for 3/31/2021 |
2021-03-17 | House | Action Def. in s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee to 3/31/2021 |
2021-03-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee for 3/17/2021 |
2021-02-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee |
2021-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee-- Government Operations for Review |
2021-02-08 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-02 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0162 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-06 - Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to first calendar of 2022