TN HB0462 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 270
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 270
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires the state board to adopt a policy allowing American sign language courses to satisfy the foreign language credits required for graduation. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 10.
Title
As enacted, requires the state board to adopt a policy allowing American sign language courses to satisfy the foreign language credits required for graduation. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 10.
Sponsors
Rep. Roger Kane [R] | Rep. Jeremy Faison [R] | Sen. Art Swann [R] | Rep. John Ragan [R] |
Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] | Rep. Bryan Terry [R] | Rep. Timothy Wirgau [R] | Rep. Harold Love [D] |
Rep. William Lamberth [R] | Rep. Joe Towns [D] | Rep. John Clemmons [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-11 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 270 | |
2017-04-24 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-04-24 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2017-04-20 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/24/2017 |
2017-04-19 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/20/2017 |
2017-04-11 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2017-04-05 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/11/2017 |
2017-04-05 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-04-05 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/5/2017 |
2017-03-22 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2017-03-22 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-03-22 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/22/2017 |
2017-03-07 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee |
2017-03-01 | House | Placed on cal. Education Instruction & Programs for 3/7/2017 |
2017-03-01 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Instruction & Programs |
2017-03-01 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education Instruction & Programs |
2017-02-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee for 3/1/2017 |
2017-02-14 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee |
2017-02-09 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Instruction & Programs-- Government Operations for Review |
2017-02-08 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-02-06 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0524 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-11 - Pub. Ch. 270