TN HB0451 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-04 - Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-04 - Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, provides that no more than 20 percent of property taken by eminent domain can be leased to private companies; grants right of first refusal to owner of land taken by eminent domain that is not converted in five years to the purpose for which it was taken. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 31; Title 13, Chapter 20 and Title 29.
Title
As introduced, provides that no more than 20 percent of property taken by eminent domain can be leased to private companies; grants right of first refusal to owner of land taken by eminent domain that is not converted in five years to the purpose for which it was taken. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 31; Title 13, Chapter 20 and Title 29.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-04 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2013-02-04 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2013-01-31 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2013-01-30 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0236 (Crossfiled) 2013-04-09 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Jud Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0451&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/HB0451.pdf |