TN HB0446 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-18 - Assigned to s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-18 - Assigned to s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, makes various changes with regard to the treatment of urn vaults, vaults, outer burial containers, and other merchandise offered by a cemetery company in pre-need contracts and in the disbursement of trust assets; clarifies the law applicable to pre-need contracts offered by cemetery companies. - Amends TCA Title 46, Chapter 1.
Title
As introduced, makes various changes with regard to the treatment of urn vaults, vaults, outer burial containers, and other merchandise offered by a cemetery company in pre-need contracts and in the disbursement of trust assets; clarifies the law applicable to pre-need contracts offered by cemetery companies. - Amends TCA Title 46, Chapter 1.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-18 | House | Assigned to s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee |
2015-02-12 | House | P2C, ref. to Business and Utilities Committee |
2015-02-11 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2015-02-09 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0870 (Crossfiled) 2015-02-18 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0446&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB0446.pdf |