TN HB0442 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 45-15)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 445
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, enacts the "Major Trevor Joseph Act," which requires the department to provide burial services for a person who died while on active duty with the armed forces and is being interred in a state veterans cemetery on a date requested by the family members of the person if the department is given notice of the burial at least 72 hours in advance of the burial. - Amends TCA Title 46, Chapter 6 and Title 58.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 46, Chapter 6 and Title 58, relative to the Major Trevor Joseph Act.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-18 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 445
2021-04-27HouseComp. SB subst.
2021-04-26HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/27/2021
2021-04-26HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/26/2021
2021-04-26HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2021-04-21HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/26/2021
2021-04-21HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2021-04-19HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/21/2021
2021-03-24HousePlaced behind the budget
2021-03-17HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/24/2021
2021-03-17HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
2021-03-09HouseRec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2021-03-03HousePlaced on cal. State Government Committee for 3/9/2021
2021-03-02HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Government Committee
2021-02-24HousePlaced on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 3/2/2021
2021-02-10HouseAssigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee
2021-02-10HouseP2C, ref. to State Government Committee
2021-02-08HouseIntro., P1C.
2021-01-29HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0793 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Pub. Ch. 445

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback