TN HB0439 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-06 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-06 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes a local law enforcement officer of the law enforcement agency of a city, county, or metropolitan government, or such officer's spouse, to obtain a retail package store license if the licensed premises is to be located outside of the jurisdiction of the officer's employing agency. - Amends TCA Title 57, Chapter 3.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 57, Chapter 3, relative to retail package store licensees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-06 | House | Returned to the Clerk's Desk. |
2021-04-06 | House | Def. to Special Calendar to be Published with Final Calendar in Departments & Agencies Subcommittee |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 4/6/2021 |
2021-03-30 | House | Action Def. in s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee to 4/6/2021 |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 3/30/2021 |
2021-03-16 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-09 | House | Reset on Final cal. of Departments & Agencies Subcommittee |
2021-03-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 3/9/2021 |
2021-03-02 | House | No action taken |
2021-02-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 3/2/2021 |
2021-02-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee |
2021-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-01-28 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0359 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-06 - Failed in Senate State and Local Government Committee