TN HB0429 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 21-4)
Status: Passed on April 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-27 - Pub. Ch. 165
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 21-4)
Status: Passed on April 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-27 - Pub. Ch. 165
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, prohibits supervisors from disciplining or discouraging teachers and other educators for reporting inaccuracies or errors or potentially inflammatory material in textbooks or other educational materials to supervisors, elected officials, or parents or guardians; prohibits requiring a teacher or other educator to agree not to report inaccuracies or errors or potentially inflammatory material in textbooks or other educational materials, as a condition of employment. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1; Title 49, Chapter 2; Title 49, Chapter 5 and Title 49, Chapter 6.
Title
As enacted, prohibits supervisors from disciplining or discouraging teachers and other educators for reporting inaccuracies or errors or potentially inflammatory material in textbooks or other educational materials to supervisors, elected officials, or parents or guardians; prohibits requiring a teacher or other educator to agree not to report inaccuracies or errors or potentially inflammatory material in textbooks or other educational materials, as a condition of employment. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1; Title 49, Chapter 2; Title 49, Chapter 5 and Title 49, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
Rep. Tilman Goins [R] | Rep. Timothy Hill [R] | Rep. Glen Casada [R] | Rep. Rick Womick [R] |
Rep. Judd Matheny [R] | Rep. Jeremy Durham [R] | Rep. Billy Spivey [R] | Rep. John DeBerry [D] |
Sen. Raumesh Akbari [D] | Rep. Mike Sparks [R] | Rep. David Byrd [R] | Rep. Andy Holt [R] |
Rep. Debra Moody [R] | Rep. Bryan Terry [R] | Rep. Harold Love [D] | Rep. Courtney Rogers [R] |
Rep. Ron Lollar [R] | Rep. David Alexander [R] | Rep. John Ragan [R] | Rep. Jerry Sexton [R] |
Rep. Eddie Smith [R] | Rep. Terri Lynn Weaver [R] | Rep. Jimmy Eldridge [R] | Rep. Jay Reedy [R] |
Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-30 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-27 | Pub. Ch. 165 | |
2015-04-27 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2015 | |
2015-04-16 | Signed by Governor. | |
2015-04-06 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2015-04-01 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2015-03-31 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 28, Nays 3, PNV 1 |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-03-26 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2015-03-26 | House | Passed H., Ayes 94, Nays 0 |
2015-03-26 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-03-19 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-03-19 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/26/2015 |
2015-03-18 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/19/2015 |
2015-03-18 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-03-17 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2015-03-17 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-03-11 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration & Planning for 3/17/2015 |
2015-03-10 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education Administration & Planning |
2015-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 3/10/2015 |
2015-03-02 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-02-12 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee |
2015-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration & Planning |
2015-02-09 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2015-02-05 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1105 (Crossfiled) 2015-04-27 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 165