CA AB2647 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-29 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Revenue and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-29 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Revenue and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 214 of, and to add and repeal Section 205.5.1 of, the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.
Title
Property taxation: disabled veterans’ exemption: welfare exemption: housing for law enforcement and firefighters.
Sponsors
Asm. Evan Low [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-29 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2024-04-11 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2024-04-10 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2024-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2024-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 205.5.1 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 214 | Amended Code | Citation Text |