TN HB0425 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 46-12)
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-06 - Pub. Ch. 277
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 46-12)
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-06 - Pub. Ch. 277
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts the "Kenneth Harry-Hill Tennessee Veterans Health Care Act of 2015," which may also be known as the "Mission Tennessee for Veterans Program". - Amends TCA Title 63 and Title 68.
Title
As enacted, enacts the "Kenneth Harry-Hill Tennessee Veterans Health Care Act of 2015," which may also be known as the "Mission Tennessee for Veterans Program". - Amends TCA Title 63 and Title 68.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-15 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-06 | Pub. Ch. 277 | |
2015-05-06 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2015 | |
2015-04-28 | Signed by Governor. | |
2015-04-21 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2015-04-16 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2015-04-15 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0400) |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-04-13 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2015-04-13 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 97, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2015-04-13 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0362) |
2015-04-13 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-04-09 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-04-09 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/13/2015 |
2015-04-08 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/9/2015 |
2015-04-07 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2015-04-06 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-04-02 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-04-01 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 4/7/2015 |
2015-04-01 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2015-04-01 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-03-26 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-03-25 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 4/1/2015 |
2015-03-25 | House | Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 4/1/2015 |
2015-03-18 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/25/2015 |
2015-03-11 | House | Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 3/25/2015 |
2015-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/11/2015 |
2015-02-18 | House | Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee |
2015-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2015-02-09 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2015-02-05 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1016 (Crossfiled) 2015-05-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 277