TN HB0409 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-07 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 503
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-07 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 503
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires judicial commissioners to complete twelve hours of continuing education each year. - Amends TCA Section 40-1-111.
Title
As enacted, requires judicial commissioners to complete twelve hours of continuing education each year. - Amends TCA Section 40-1-111.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Pitts [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-07 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 503 | |
2009-06-17 | Comp. SB subst. | |
2009-06-16 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/17/09 | |
2009-06-16 | Reset on regular cal. for 6/17/09 | |
2009-06-16 | Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/16/2009 | |
2009-06-16 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 06/16/2009 | |
2009-06-15 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2009-06-15 | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 06/15/2009 | |
2009-06-15 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2009-06-11 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 06/15/2009 | |
2009-04-08 | Placed Behind the Budget | |
2009-04-01 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 04/08/2009 | |
2009-04-01 | Assigned to s/c Budget of FW&M | |
2009-04-01 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2009-03-25 | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 04/01/2009 | |
2009-03-24 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Judiciary Committee | |
2009-03-18 | Placed on s/c cal Civil Practice and Procedure of JUD for 03/24/2009 | |
2009-02-17 | Assigned to s/c Civil Practice and Procedure of JUD | |
2009-02-12 | P2C, ref. to Judiciary | |
2009-02-11 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-09 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0307 (Crossfiled) 2009-07-07 - Pub. Ch. 503
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0409&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB0409.pdf |