TN HB0401 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 152
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 152
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes the court of workers' compensation claims to award additional attorneys' fees and costs incurred when an employer wrongfully denies a claim or wrongfully fails to timely initiate benefits to which the employee or dependent is entitled for injuries that occur between July 1, 2021, and June 30, 2023. - Amends TCA Section 50-6-226.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 50-6-226, relative to workers' compensation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-21 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 152 | |
2021-03-22 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2021-03-22 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-18 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/22/2021 |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/18/2021 |
2021-03-16 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-03-10 | House | Placed on cal. Commerce Committee for 3/16/2021 |
2021-03-10 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Commerce Committee |
2021-03-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee for 3/10/2021 |
2021-03-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee |
2021-03-01 | House | Ref. to Commerce Committee |
2021-02-10 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2021-02-08 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-01-25 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1576 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-21 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2021