TN HB0396 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Pub. Ch. 226
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Pub. Ch. 226
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, clarifies applicable date in regard to a hotel facility under the Convention Center and Tourism Development Financing Act of 1998 and the apportionment and distribution of the incremental increase in local sales and use tax revenue associated with the qualified hotel facility. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 88, Part 1.
Title
As enacted, clarifies applicable date in regard to a hotel facility under the Convention Center and Tourism Development Financing Act of 1998 and the apportionment and distribution of the incremental increase in local sales and use tax revenue associated with the qualified hotel facility. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 88, Part 1.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark White [R] | Rep. Ron Gant [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-15 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | Pub. Ch. 226 | |
2019-05-09 | Effective date(s) 04/30/2019 | |
2019-04-30 | Signed by Governor. | |
2019-04-23 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-04-18 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-04-17 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0253) |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-04-15 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2019-04-15 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 97, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2019-04-15 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0215) |
2019-04-04 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/15/2019 |
2019-04-03 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/4/2019 |
2019-03-27 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Placed on cal. Local Committee for 3/27/2019 |
2019-03-19 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Local Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Cities & Counties Subcommittee for 3/19/2019 |
2019-02-06 | House | Assigned to s/c Cities & Counties Subcommittee |
2019-02-06 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Committee |
2019-02-04 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0212 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 226