TN SB0212 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 226
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 226
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, clarifies applicable date in regard to a hotel facility under the Convention Center and Tourism Development Financing Act of 1998 and the apportionment and distribution of the incremental increase in local sales and use tax revenue associated with the qualified hotel facility. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 88, Part 1.
Title
As enacted, clarifies applicable date in regard to a hotel facility under the Convention Center and Tourism Development Financing Act of 1998 and the apportionment and distribution of the incremental increase in local sales and use tax revenue associated with the qualified hotel facility. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 88, Part 1.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-09 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 226 | |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/15/2019 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/9/2019 |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/9/2019 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/2/2019 |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0396 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-09 - Pub. Ch. 226