TN HB0395 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-5)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires any bus ordered or purchased on or after July 1, 2018, to be equipped with a restraint system; requires any bus that is currently used to transport students be equipped with a restraint system by July 1, 2023. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 21 and Title 55, Chapter 9, Part 6.
Title
As introduced, requires any bus ordered or purchased on or after July 1, 2018, to be equipped with a restraint system; requires any bus that is currently used to transport students be equipped with a restraint system by July 1, 2023. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 21 and Title 55, Chapter 9, Part 6.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-04 - House - TRANSPORTATION COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Education Administration & Planning (Y: 9 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-04-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/18/18 |
2018-04-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/13/2018 |
2018-03-28 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2018-03-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/28/2018 |
2018-03-15 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-08-02 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-05-08 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-05-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 5/8/2017 |
2017-04-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 5/2/2017 |
2017-04-26 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2017-04-25 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/26/2017 |
2017-04-25 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2017-04-25 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-04-19 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 4/26/2017 |
2017-04-18 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Government Operations Committee |
2017-04-12 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration & Planning for 4/18/2017 |
2017-04-12 | House | Action def. in Education Administration & Planning to 4/18/2017 |
2017-04-06 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration & Planning for 4/11/2017 |
2017-04-04 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Education Administration & Planning |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 4/4/2017 |
2017-03-28 | House | Action def. in Transportation Committee to 4/4/2017 |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 3/28/2017 |
2017-03-22 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee |
2017-03-16 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 3/22/2017 |
2017-02-08 | House | Assigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee |
2017-02-08 | House | P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee-- Education Administration & Planning-- Government Operations for Review |
2017-02-06 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-02-02 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0381 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-24 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee