TN HB0387 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-06 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-06 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, extends the Tennessee economic council on women, June 30, 2019. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29, Part 2 and Title 4, Chapter 50.
Title
As introduced, extends the Tennessee economic council on women, June 30, 2019. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29, Part 2 and Title 4, Chapter 50.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-02 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-06 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-04-02 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2015-04-02 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 93, Nays 2, PNV 0 |
2015-04-02 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0123) |
2015-04-02 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-03-26 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/2/2015 |
2015-03-25 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/26/2015 |
2015-03-24 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2015-03-18 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/24/2015 |
2015-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee |
2015-02-09 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2015-02-04 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0256 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-16 - Failed in Senate Government Operations Committee