TN SB0256 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-16 - Failed in Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-16 - Failed in Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, extends the Tennessee economic council on women, June 30, 2019. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29, Part 2 and Title 4, Chapter 50.
Title
As introduced, extends the Tennessee economic council on women, June 30, 2019. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29, Part 2 and Title 4, Chapter 50.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Bell [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-04 - Senate - SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Failed in Senate Government Operations Committee (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-16 | Senate | Failed in Senate Government Operations Committee |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 3/16/2016 |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Government Operations Committee to 3/16/2016 |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 3/9/2016 |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Government Operations Committee to 3/9/2016 |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 3/2/2016 |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Failed in Senate Government Operations Committee |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 3/4/2015 |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Government Operations Committee to 3/4/2015 |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 2/25/2015 |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Government Operations Committee to 2/25/2015 |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 2/18/2015 |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0387 (Crossfiled) 2015-04-06 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration