TN HB0382 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-3)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 354
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-3)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 354
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, expands the offense of unlawful photography to include a photograph taken without an individual's consent and the focus of the photograph is the intimate area of the individual or would offend or embarrass an ordinary person and the photograph was taken for the purpose of sexual arousal of the defendant. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 13, Part 6.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39, Chapter 13, Part 6, relative to unlawful photography.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 354 | |
2021-04-28 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2021-04-28 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-22 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/28/2021 |
2021-04-21 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/22/2021 |
2021-04-15 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-14 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-04-07 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 4/14/2021 |
2021-04-07 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-07 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 4/7/2021 |
2021-03-31 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 4/7/2021 |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/31/2021 |
2021-02-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2021-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-01-22 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0331 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2021