TN HB0373 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-17 - Assigned to s/c Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-17 - Assigned to s/c Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, increases the maximum fine for any person who is convicted of three or more Class A misdemeanors in a 90-day period from $2,500 to $7,500. - Amends TCA Title 40.
Title
As introduced, increases the maximum fine for any person who is convicted of three or more Class A misdemeanors in a 90-day period from $2,500 to $7,500. - Amends TCA Title 40.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-02-17 | Assigned to s/c Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD | |
2009-02-11 | P2C, ref. to Judiciary | |
2009-02-09 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-06 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0292 (Crossfiled) 2009-02-12 - P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0373&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB0373.pdf |