TN HB0370 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-11 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-11 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, deems commissioners for uniform state laws appointed by the governor to not be officials in the legislative branch for purposes of ethics and lobbying statutes. - Amends TCA Title 3 and Title 4, Chapter 9.
Title
As introduced, deems commissioners for uniform state laws appointed by the governor to not be officials in the legislative branch for purposes of ethics and lobbying statutes. - Amends TCA Title 3 and Title 4, Chapter 9.
Sponsors
Rep. Glen Casada [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-02-11 | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. | |
2009-02-09 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-05 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0302 (Crossfiled) 2009-02-12 - P2C, ref. to S. Govt. Ops. Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0370&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB0370.pdf |