TN HB0356 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-27 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee of State Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires the commissioner to produce a survey for a person leaving state service that attempts to ascertain why the person is leaving and any suggestions the person may have to improve state service; requires commissioner to submit a report each year detailing the number of persons who voluntarily left state service and a summary of the surveys. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 8.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, requires the commissioner to produce a survey for a person leaving state service that attempts to ascertain why the person is leaving and any suggestions the person may have to improve state service; requires commissioner to submit a report each year detailing the number of persons who voluntarily left state service and a summary of the surveys. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 8.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-27HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee of State Committee
2019-02-20HousePlaced on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 2/27/2019
2019-02-05HouseAssigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee
2019-02-04HouseP2C, ref. to State Committee
2019-01-31HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-01-30HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0841 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-11 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback