TN HB0349 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-17 - Assigned to s/c Civil Practice and Procedure of JUD
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-17 - Assigned to s/c Civil Practice and Procedure of JUD
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires an attorney in fact to be a witness to any codicils to a will in which the testator has executed a durable power of attorney. - Amends TCA Title 32, Chapter 1, Part 1.
Title
As introduced, requires an attorney in fact to be a witness to any codicils to a will in which the testator has executed a durable power of attorney. - Amends TCA Title 32, Chapter 1, Part 1.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-02-17 | Assigned to s/c Civil Practice and Procedure of JUD | |
2009-02-11 | P2C, ref. to Judiciary | |
2009-02-09 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-05 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0528 (Crossfiled) 2009-02-12 - P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0349&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB0349.pdf |