TN HB0348 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-23 - Taken off notice for cal. in State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-23 - Taken off notice for cal. in State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, reduces from two to one the number of credible witnesses who must be present when a law enforcement officer destroys an illegal distillery, still, fermenting equipment, or related property. - Amends amend TCA Title 57.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 57, relative to alcoholic beverages.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-23 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in State Government Committee |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/23/2021 |
2021-03-16 | House | Action def. in State Government Committee to 3/23/2021 |
2021-03-10 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/16/2021 |
2021-03-09 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2021-03-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 3/9/2021 |
2021-03-02 | House | Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee |
2021-03-02 | House | Ref. to State Government Committee |
2021-02-10 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2021-02-08 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-01-21 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0391 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-23 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee