TN HB0346 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-06 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-06 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, increases the homestead exemption relative to garnishments; creates homestead exemption for agricultural land; requires the fiscal review committee to recommend to the general assembly every three years suggested increases in the homestead exemption. - Amends TCA Title 26 and Title 30.
Title
As introduced, increases the homestead exemption relative to garnishments; creates homestead exemption for agricultural land; requires the fiscal review committee to recommend to the general assembly every three years suggested increases in the homestead exemption. - Amends TCA Title 26 and Title 30.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-06 | House | Withdrawn. |
2019-02-05 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2019-02-04 | House | P2C, ref. to Judiciary |
2019-01-31 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-01-30 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0346&ga=111 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Bill/HB0346.pdf |