TN HB0333 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-10 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-10 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, grants the comptroller of the treasury the option to report the annual actuarial study of the TennCare program, as well as the oral and written comments to the final study, to the applicable legislative committees in an electronic format. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 56 and Title 71.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 56 and Title 71, relative to TennCare.
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Hicks [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-10 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2021-02-08 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-01-20 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0609 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-21 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee