TN HB0322 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-22 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Domestic Relations of C&FA of Children and Family Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-22 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Domestic Relations of C&FA of Children and Family Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, abolishes the common law tort of parental alienation; prohibits parental alienation syndrome from being a factor to consider in a child custody dispute; and prohibits the use of a claim of parental alienation by a parent who has been found to be the perpetrator of child abuse to rebut the presumption that it is detrimental to the child to award custody to such parent. - Amends TCA Title 36.
Title
As introduced, abolishes the common law tort of parental alienation; prohibits parental alienation syndrome from being a factor to consider in a child custody dispute; and prohibits the use of a claim of parental alienation by a parent who has been found to be the perpetrator of child abuse to rebut the presumption that it is detrimental to the child to award custody to such parent. - Amends TCA Title 36.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-22 | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Domestic Relations of C&FA of Children and Family Affairs Committee | |
2009-04-16 | Placed on s/c cal Domestic Relations of C&FA for 04/22/2009 | |
2009-04-14 | Assigned to s/c Domestic Relations of C&FA | |
2009-02-11 | P2C, ref. to Children and Family Affairs Committee | |
2009-02-09 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-04 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1662 (Crossfiled) 2009-02-18 - P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0322&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB0322.pdf |