TN HB0319 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-05 - Assigned to s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-05 - Assigned to s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, extends the effective date for newly published regulations involving cooperative agreements between the TWRA and federal agencies, from 30 days to 45 days after the publication date by the TWRA; revises due date for the submission of financial reports by the TWRA executive director to the governor and commission members, from September 15 to September 30 of each year. - Amends TCA Title 70.
Title
As introduced, extends the effective date for newly published regulations involving cooperative agreements between the TWRA and federal agencies, from 30 days to 45 days after the publication date by the TWRA; revises due date for the submission of financial reports by the TWRA executive director to the governor and commission members, from September 15 to September 30 of each year. - Amends TCA Title 70.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Assigned to s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee |
2019-02-04 | House | P2C, ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
2019-01-31 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-01-30 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0440 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-20 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Energy, Ag., & Nat. Resources Committee