TN HB0310 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-10 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-10 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, deletes the requirement that a person file a petition with the court in order to have the public records regarding a criminal offense expunged if certain qualifying events have occurred, including the charge against the person was dismissed or a no true bill was returned by a grand jury. - Amends TCA Title 40.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 40, relative to expunction of certain records.
Sponsors
Rep. Jesse Chism [D] | Rep. Dan Howell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-10 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-01-24 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2023-01-21 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2023-01-20 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-19 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0109 (Crossfiled) 2023-01-31 - Sponsor(s) Added.