TN HB0304 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-12 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c HHR Subcommittee of Health & Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-12 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c HHR Subcommittee of Health & Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, adds six chemical derivatives of the Schedule I controlled substance methcathinone as Schedule I drugs. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 4.
Title
As introduced, adds six chemical derivatives of the Schedule I controlled substance methcathinone as Schedule I drugs. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 4.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-12 | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c HHR Subcommittee of Health & Human Resources Committee | |
2011-04-06 | Placed on s/c cal HHR Subcommittee for 4/12/2011 | |
2011-04-05 | Action Def. in s/c HHR Subcommittee to 4/12/2011 | |
2011-03-30 | Placed on s/c cal HHR Subcommittee for 4/5/2011 | |
2011-03-29 | Action Def. in s/c HHR Subcommittee to 4/5/2011 | |
2011-03-23 | Placed on s/c cal HHR Subcommittee for 3/29/2011 | |
2011-02-10 | Assigned to s/c HHR Subcommittee | |
2011-02-10 | P2C, ref. to Health & Human Resources Committee | |
2011-02-09 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-07 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0329 (Crossfiled) 2011-05-19 - Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 5/20/2011
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0304&ga=107 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/107/Bill/HB0304.pdf |