TN HB0298 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-05 - Assigned to s/c Public Service & Employees Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, authorizes county governments to hire up to two firefighters to staff each volunteer fire department station in the county; requires the state to pay for the health and retirement benefits for firefighters employed under this bill. - Amends TCA Title 5, Chapter 17 and Title 8.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, authorizes county governments to hire up to two firefighters to staff each volunteer fire department station in the county; requires the state to pay for the health and retirement benefits for firefighters employed under this bill. - Amends TCA Title 5, Chapter 17 and Title 8.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-05HouseAssigned to s/c Public Service & Employees Subcommittee
2019-02-04HouseP2C, ref. to State Committee
2019-01-31HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-01-30HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0851 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-03 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback