TN HB0297 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - Taken off notice for cal. in Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, enacts the STOP Act to authorize a sentence of imprisonment for not more than 11 months, 29 days for a conviction of not stopping for a school bus that is loading or unloading children; authorizes LEAs to install and operate an external video system for the detection and prosecution of such violations. - Amends TCA Title 10; Title 39; Title 40; Title 49 and Title 55, Chapter 8.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, enacts the STOP Act to authorize a sentence of imprisonment for not more than 11 months, 29 days for a conviction of not stopping for a school bus that is loading or unloading children; authorizes LEAs to install and operate an external video system for the detection and prosecution of such violations. - Amends TCA Title 10; Title 39; Title 40; Title 49 and Title 55, Chapter 8.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-26HouseTaken off notice for cal. in Transportation Committee
2019-03-20HousePlaced on cal. Transportation Committee for 3/26/2019
2019-03-19HouseAction def. in Transportation Committee to 3/26/2019
2019-03-13HousePlaced on cal. Transportation Committee for 3/19/2019
2019-03-12HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee
2019-03-06HousePlaced on s/c cal Safety & Funding Subcommittee for 3/12/2019
2019-02-05HouseAssigned to s/c Safety & Funding Subcommittee
2019-02-04HouseP2C, ref. to Transportation Committee
2019-01-31HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-01-30HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0853 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-11 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback