TN SB0853 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-11 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-11 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the STOP Act to authorize a sentence of imprisonment for not more than 11 months, 29 days for a conviction of not stopping for a school bus that is loading or unloading children; authorizes LEAs to install and operate an external video system for the detection and prosecution of such violations. - Amends TCA Title 10; Title 39; Title 40; Title 49 and Title 55, Chapter 8.
Title
As introduced, enacts the STOP Act to authorize a sentence of imprisonment for not more than 11 months, 29 days for a conviction of not stopping for a school bus that is loading or unloading children; authorizes LEAs to install and operate an external video system for the detection and prosecution of such violations. - Amends TCA Title 10; Title 39; Title 40; Title 49 and Title 55, Chapter 8.
Sponsors
Sen. Rusty Crowe [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0297 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-26 - Taken off notice for cal. in Transportation Committee