TN HB0273 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-06-04 - Taken off notice for cal. in Consumer and Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, enacts the "Save Tennessee Call Center Jobs Act of 2019." - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 9; Title 12; Title 50 and Title 67.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, enacts the "Save Tennessee Call Center Jobs Act of 2019." - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 9; Title 12; Title 50 and Title 67.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-04HouseTaken off notice for cal. in Consumer and Human Resources Committee
2020-05-27HousePlaced on cal. Consumer and Human Resources Committee for 6/4/2020
2020-03-16HouseMeeting Canceled
2020-03-11HousePlaced on cal. Consumer and Human Resources Committee for 3/16/2020
2020-03-10HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Consumer and Human Resources Committee
2020-03-04HousePlaced on s/c cal Employee Affairs Subcommittee for 3/10/2020
2019-03-19HouseDef. to Summer Study in Employee Affairs Subcommittee
2019-03-13HousePlaced on s/c cal Employee Affairs Subcommittee for 3/19/2019
2019-03-13HouseReassigned to s/c Employee Affairs Subcommittee
2019-02-26HouseReturned to Clerk's Desk
2019-02-20HousePlaced on s/c cal Employee Affairs Subcommittee for 2/26/2019
2019-02-19HouseAction Def. in s/c Employee Affairs Subcommittee to 2/26/2019
2019-02-13HousePlaced on s/c cal Employee Affairs Subcommittee for 2/19/2019
2019-02-01HouseAssigned to s/c Employee Affairs Subcommittee
2019-01-31HouseP2C, ref. to Consumer and Human Resources Committee
2019-01-30HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-01-29HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0461 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate Commerce & Labor Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback