TN SB0461 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 1 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/26/2019
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Hearing: Mar 26 @ 1:00 pm in Cordell Hull Building
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, enacts the "Save Tennessee Call Center Jobs Act of 2019." - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 9; Title 12; Title 50 and Title 67.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, enacts the "Save Tennessee Call Center Jobs Act of 2019." - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 9; Title 12; Title 50 and Title 67.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19SenatePlaced on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/26/2019
2019-02-20SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2019-02-19SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2019-02-12SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2019-02-06SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
2019-02-04SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-01SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0273 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-19 - Def. to Summer Study in Employee Affairs Subcommittee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback