TN HB0267 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Effective date(s) 04/30/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Effective date(s) 04/30/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, extends the board of nursing to June 30, 2023. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 63, Chapter 7.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 63, Chapter 7, relative to the board of nursing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MESSAGE CALENDAR CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 1 (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Effective date(s) 04/30/2021 | |
2021-05-18 | Pub. Ch. 288 | |
2021-04-30 | Signed by Governor. | |
2021-04-20 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-04-15 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-04-14 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2021-04-12 | House | H. concurred in S. am. no. SA1 Ayes 90, Nays 0 PNV 0 HB0267 |
2021-04-08 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 4/12/21 |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 29, Nays 0 |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0163) |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-03-09 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2021-03-08 | House | Passed H., Ayes 91, Nays 0, PNV 4 |
2021-03-08 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-04 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/8/2021 |
2021-03-03 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/4/2021 |
2021-02-22 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 2/22/2021 |
2021-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-01-20 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0040 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 288